Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 12:41:06 (UTC).

POZ, KELLY VS REYES, LIMARY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 POZ, KELLY filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against REYES, LIMARY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

POZ KELLY

Respondent

REYES LIMARY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

1/22/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

1/27/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

1/27/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

1/12/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Civil Harassment

1/12/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

1/12/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/12/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less