This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 17:44:50 (UTC).

POSTACHIAN, JOSE MARIA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 POSTACHIAN, JOSE MARIA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R., STRATTON, MARIA E. and SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3964

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

STRATTON, MARIA E.

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YERNAZIAN CLAUDIA

Claimants

DISCOVER BANK

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC ON BEHALF OF CITIBANK N.A.

Decedent

POSTACHIAN JOSE MARIA

Not Classified By Court

PRICE STANELY M.

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

LAW OFFICE OF ARMEN BAGHDASARIAN APC

Other

POSTACHIAN JAVIER

Interested Party

RISLEY ROBERT L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KAPOOR MANISHA VINOD

KAPOOR MANISHA V.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

8/8/2017: Notice - NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Supplement - Supplement To Report of Sale

9/22/2017: Supplement - Supplement To Report of Sale

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling

11/17/2017: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/15/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

7/16/2018: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Order - Order Confirming Sale of Real Property

10/13/2017: Order - Order Confirming Sale of Real Property

Notice - Administration to Creditors

8/8/2017: Notice - Administration to Creditors

Minute Order

3/14/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/3/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

5/25/2017: Proof of Publication

Notice - Hearing

5/9/2017: Notice - Hearing

Supplement - Supplement To First and Final Report and Account of Administrator; Petition For Statutory Attorney's Fees, and For Distribution

6/22/2018: Supplement - Supplement To First and Final Report and Account of Administrator; Petition For Statutory Attorney's Fees, and For Distribution

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/15/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - ORDER APPT PROB REF

8/15/2017: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - ORDER APPT PROB REF

Minute Order

12/6/2017: Minute Order

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

5/5/2017: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Creditor's Claim

7/5/2017: Creditor's Claim

Inventory & Appraisal - Final - Property Tax Certificate

9/22/2017: Inventory & Appraisal - Final - Property Tax Certificate

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • in Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Order (Proposed Order Re First and Final Report and Account of Administrator; Petition For Statutory Attorney's Fees and For Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • in Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Supplement (Supplement To First and Final Report and Account of Administrator; Petition For Statutory Attorney's Fees, and For Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • Bond (LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • in Probate Department 5, Stratton, Maria E., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Supplement (SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION FOR PROBATE ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less