This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 21:52:31 (UTC).

POSSE, CONSTANCE VS POSSE, CARL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 POSSE, CONSTANCE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against POSSE, CARL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PELLMAN, AMY M. and WILCOX, WENDY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2905

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILCOX, WENDY L.

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

POSSE CONSTANCE

Respondent

POSSE CARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HUGHES ARELIS

BRAUN MARIE IRMA

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

CRAMPTON ELISABETH CELESTE

Respondent Attorney

QUINLEY SHANON KEALOHA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order as Order After Hearing

6/9/2022: Minute Order as Order After Hearing

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

6/8/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Dissomaster Printout - Proposed Dissomaster Printout

6/8/2022: Dissomaster Printout - Proposed Dissomaster Printout

Minute Order

6/9/2022: Minute Order

Reply - Reply

6/2/2022: Reply - Reply

Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration to RFO Child & Spousal Support and Attorney Fees

5/27/2022: Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration to RFO Child & Spousal Support and Attorney Fees

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

5/27/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

5/27/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

4/28/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

4/13/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

3/22/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense

RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - RFO/MTN - Spousal Support

3/23/2022: RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - RFO/MTN - Spousal Support

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

3/23/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

3/24/2022: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

3/29/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

3/29/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

2/2/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 81 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 81, Wilcox, Wendy L., Presiding; RFO - Spousal Support - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order as Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDissomaster Printout (Proposed Dissomaster Printout ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketReply (Reply ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303 (Declaration - Request for (Ex Parte) Orders FL-303 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Ex Parte - Application ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAUN MARIE I

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUGHES ARELIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAMPTON ELISABETH CELESTE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F