This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 00:57:50 (UTC).

PORSCHE LEASING LTD ET AL VS CHRISTOPHER USUDE

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 PORSCHE LEASING LTD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER USUDE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3933

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

BENTLEY FINANCIAL SERVICES

PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

PORSCHE LEASING LTD

Defendant

USUDE CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER STACEY A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR POSSESSION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT, FORECLOSURE OF SECURITY INTEREST WITH DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT, BREACH OF EXPRESS WRITTEN CONTRACT, MONEY LENT AND ACCOUNT STATE

2/14/2018: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR POSSESSION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT, FORECLOSURE OF SECURITY INTEREST WITH DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT, BREACH OF EXPRESS WRITTEN CONTRACT, MONEY LENT AND ACCOUNT STATE

SUMMONS

2/14/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/22/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Porsche Leasing LTD (Plaintiff); Porsche financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; (OSC - No Return of Service; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Porsche Leasing LTD (Plaintiff); Porsche financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR POSSESSION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT, FORECLOSURE OF SECURITY INTEREST WITH DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT, BREACH OF EXPRESS WRITTEN CONTRACT, MONEY LENT AND ACCOUNT STATED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ORIGINAL FILED

Superior Court of California THARPE & HOWELL, LLP County of Los Angeles 15250 Ventura Boulevard, Ninth Floor Sherman Oaks, California 91403 FEB 14 2018

- (818) 205-9955; (818) 205-9944 fax Sherri R, Carter, Executive Officer/Clerk STACEY A. MILLER, ESQ.; STATE BAR NO.: 161628 Bym, Deputy

Nioses Soto Attorneys for Plaintiffs, PORSCHE LEASING LTD, and PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. dba BENTLEY FINANCIAL SERVICES

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

PORSCHE LEASING LTD., and PORSCHE | CaseNo. B8C 69393 3 FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. dba

BENTLEY FINANCIAL SERVICES, Complaint Filed: Civil Unlimited Jurisdiction : Plaintiffs, fassigned to the Honorable , Dept ] V. YERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR POSSESSION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY, DEFICIENCY CHRISTOPHER USUDE. an individual; JUDGMENT, FORECLOSURE OF DOES 1 to 10, inclusive, SECURITY INTEREST WITH DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT, BREACH OF EXPRESS Defendant. WRITTEN CONTRACT, MONEY LENT AND

ACCOUNT STATED

Plaintiffs, PORSCHE LEASING LTD. and PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC,, both Delaware‘ Corporations, hereinafter referred to, collectively, as Plaintiff, allege as follows:

1. At all times mentioned herein, plaintiffs were and are corporations, authorized to do and doing business in the County of Los Angeles in the State of California.

2, Plaintiffs are informed and believe and thereupon allege that defendant, CHRISTOPHER USUDE (“USUDE”) was a natural person and competent adult, residing in the City of West Hollywood, County of Los Angeles, State of California.

3. The true names and capacities of defendants DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, are unknown to plaintiffs who therefore sue said defendants by such fictitious names pursuant to

Section 474 of the California Code of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs will seek leave of court to amend

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENTLEY FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PORSCHE LEASING LTD. is a litigant