This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 09:23:45 (UTC).

PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., ET AL. VS GRIGORI SEDRAKYAN

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GRIGORI SEDRAKYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0904

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

PORSCHE LEASING LTD.

Defendant

SEDRAKYAN GRIGORI

Glendale, CA 91201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER STACEY A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/6/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/6/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SARAH J. REYNOLDS IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

9/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SARAH J. REYNOLDS IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/29/2021: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

9/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/Default Prove-up Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Hearing12/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of OSC (Name Extension) (Notice Of Order To Show Cause Re Failure To File Default Judgment); Filed by PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); PORSCHE LEASING LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Of Sarah J. Reynolds In Response To Order To Show Cause Re: Failure To File Proof Of Service); Filed by PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); PORSCHE LEASING LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by PORSCHE LEASING LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); PORSCHE LEASING LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); PORSCHE LEASING LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff); PORSCHE LEASING LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES. INC. is a litigant