Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2020 at 11:51:40 (UTC).

POLLACK, DANIELLE VS MARRS, LEO

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 POLLACK, DANIELLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MARRS, LEO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0132

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

POLLACK DANIELLE

Respondent

MARRS LEO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/5/2020: Minute Order

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

6/5/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

6/5/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

6/5/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/5/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted

6/5/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F, Lopez-Giss, Susan, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partly Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less