This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2022 at 06:32:33 (UTC).

POLANCO ORTIZ, OSCAR A VS HERNANDEZ VALENZUELA, MARTHA

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 POLANCO ORTIZ, OSCAR A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HERNANDEZ VALENZUELA, MARTHA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, PATRICIA A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2843

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOUNG, PATRICIA A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

POLANCO ORTIZ OSCAR A

Respondent

HERNANDEZ VALENZUELA MARTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ACEVEDO OSCAR

JONES AYINDE ADISA

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

5/13/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/13/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations)

5/12/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) - DV w/o Minor Child ??? New Case Petition (Petitions)

5/12/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) - DV w/o Minor Child ??? New Case Petition (Petitions)

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

5/12/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

5/12/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

5/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

6/3/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Substitution of Attorney

6/3/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/3/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

6/3/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

5/26/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 13 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 13, Young, Patricia A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation) (DV w/o Minor Child ??? New Case Petition (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES AYINDE A