This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 15:17:50 (UTC).

PMA EQUITIES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS VICTORIA TRINH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 PMA EQUITIES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VICTORIA TRINH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8941

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PMA EQUITIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

CHEN RUI

CHEN TING

HE JUNQIN

HE RONGJIE

NGUYEN HOANG LONG

TRINH VICTORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEIDE RICHARD LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/5/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PMA EQUITIES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PMA EQUITIES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PMA EQUITIES LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seide, Richard L