This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 14:16:18 (UTC).

PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS TU QIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against TU QIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0371

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLAZA WEST COVINA LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

QIAN TU DBA WE RELAX SPA

YU XUE LI DBA WE RELAX SPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROYAL GRANT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/13/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

4/13/2022: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

4/13/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/13/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (XUE LI YU)

4/14/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (XUE LI YU)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (TU QIAN)

4/14/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (TU QIAN)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/14/2022: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • Hearing08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • Hearing08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((XUE LI YU)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((TU QIAN)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAZA WEST COVINA INC is a litigant