This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 22:50:34 (UTC).

PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS R&P ENTERPRISES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS AURORA CRYO WELLNESS SPA, ET

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R P ENTERPRISES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS AURORA CRYO WELLNESS SPA, ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0065

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLAZA WEST COVINA LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

HALL PETER

R&P ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY INDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS AURORA CRYO WELLNESS SPA

WISEMAN ROY

WISEMAN TESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KRAMER BRENT ADAM

Other Attorneys

FREEDMAN JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

10/13/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

10/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer

7/6/2021: Answer

Answer

7/6/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Service by Mail

8/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/7/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

9/7/2021: Notice of Settlement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS AGAINST R&P ENTERPRISES LLC AND TESS WISEMAN

6/25/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS AGAINST R&P ENTERPRISES LLC AND TESS WISEMAN

Case Management Statement

6/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

6/1/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

6/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/11/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by R&P Enterprises LLC, a California limited liability company, individually and doing business as Aurora Cryo Wellness Spa (Defendant); Peter Hall (Defendant); Roy Wiseman (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Plaza West Covina LP, a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAZA WEST COVINA INC is a litigant