This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 22:12:59 (UTC).

PINKY'S IRON DOORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS TOI, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 PINKY'S IRON DOORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOI, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7513

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINKY'S IRON DOORS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

TOI INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LALAZARIAN DAVID

Defendant Attorney

PARK WON M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/11/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/26/2020

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/26/2020

Answer

3/30/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/20/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/24/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Toi, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pinky's Iron Doors, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pinky's Iron Doors, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Pinky's Iron Doors, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:13 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/26/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Toi, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Pinky's Iron Doors, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pinky's Iron Doors, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pinky's Iron Doors, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pinky's Iron Doors, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pinky's Iron Doors, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less