This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 17:16:03 (UTC).

PINGFANG ZHANG VS K & M MEAT COMPANY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 PINGFANG ZHANG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against K M MEAT COMPANY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6035

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHANG PINGFANG

Defendants

CULP JOY

DOE NORIEL

GOMEZ JOEL

K & M MEAT COMPANY INC.

KM FOODSERVICE

PENSKE LEASING AND RENTAL COMPANY

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. L.P.

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION

PTL GP LLC

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

UBER USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/20/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/15/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/16/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2024
  • Hearing07/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Hearing12/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pingfang Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pingfang Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pingfang Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pingfang Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Penske Leasing & Rental Company is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases where K & M MEAT COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant