Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 00:21:35 (UTC).

PILAR M BONAPARTE AGRAPHIOTIS ET AL VS ERIN OLSEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 PILAR M BONAPARTE AGRAPHIOTIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ERIN OLSEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2513

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AGRAPHIOTIS DIMITRI

BONAPARTE AGRAPHIOTIS PILAR M.

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

NO-KILL LOS ANGELES (NKLA) A NON PROFIT

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

DOE CORPORATION AND ROE PARTNERSHIP

OLSEN ERIN

BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY

GOLDBERG GINA

NO-KILL LOS ANGELES NKLA A NON PROFIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ZUKOR ABRAM CHARLES ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ELLROD ANTHONY J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer

10/30/2018: Answer

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Proof of Personal Service -

10/3/2018: Proof of Personal Service -

CoverSheet -

9/17/2018: CoverSheet -

Summons -

9/17/2018: Summons -

Complaint -

9/17/2018: Complaint -

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pilar M. Bonaparte Agraphiotis (Plaintiff); Dimitri Agraphiotis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Erin Olsen (Defendant); Gina Goldberg (Defendant); Best Friends Animal Society (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Pilar M. Bonaparte Agraphiotis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Pilar M. Bonaparte Agraphiotis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Pilar M. Bonaparte Agraphiotis (Plaintiff); Dimitri Agraphiotis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pilar M. Bonaparte Agraphiotis (Plaintiff); Dimitri Agraphiotis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLROD ANTHONY J.