This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 01:43:06 (UTC).

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1823

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYARS VENETIA

Defendant Attorney

TONG GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/12/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

4/14/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

4/19/2022: Notice of Ruling

Answer

3/11/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/14/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

1/14/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • Hearing10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. (Defendant); KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY, (Defendant); KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESBYTERIAN INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTH BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant