This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2022 at 08:54:25 (UTC).

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION, ET AL. VS HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, A CALIFORNIA FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, A CALIFORNIA FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0021

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK A CALIFORNIA FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION

LAKESIDE MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

REGAL MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIAO JENNIFER

Defendant Attorneys

AMIR MICHAEL M

TORRES PAUL MICHAEL

AMIR MICHAEL M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/12/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Case Management Statement

4/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/5/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

5/11/2022: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2023
  • Hearing09/13/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • Hearing08/30/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Heritage Provider Network, a California for-profit corporation (Defendant); Lakeside Medical Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Regal Medical Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Heritage Provider Network, a California for-profit corporation (Defendant); Lakeside Medical Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Regal Medical Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PIH Health Hospital - Whittier, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Heritage Provider Network, a California for-profit corporation (Defendant); Lakeside Medical Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Regal Medical Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PIH Health Hospital - Whittier, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PIH Health Hospital - Whittier, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PIH Health Hospital - Whittier, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PIH Health Hospital - Whittier, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); PIH Health Hospital - Downey, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PIH Health Hospital - Whittier, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); PIH Health Hospital - Downey, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PIH Health Hospital - Whittier, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff); PIH Health Hospital - Downey, a California non-profit public benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where PRESBYTERIAN INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant