This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 07:01:39 (UTC).

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY, ET AL. VS E.A.B. & M. CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against E A B M CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0821

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER

Defendant

E.A.B. & M. CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YERETSIAN SARKIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/8/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • Hearing04/12/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY (Plaintiff); PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY (Plaintiff); PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY (Plaintiff); PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - DOWNEY (Plaintiff); PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL - WHITTIER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where PRESBYTERIAN INTERCOMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YERETSIAN SARKIS