This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 07:47:33 (UTC).

PIGGEE, SARAH M. VS JONES, RYAN MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 PIGGEE, SARAH M filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JONES, RYAN MICHAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0936

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PIGGEE SARAH M.

Respondent

JONES RYAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

10/1/2020: Proof of Service

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

9/25/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

9/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

9/25/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • Hearing10/27/2020 at 1:30 PM in Department 6 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less