This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 05:30:14 (UTC).

PIEDAD TORRES VS AMERICAN APPAREL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 PIEDAD TORRES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AMERICAN APPAREL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3481

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TORRES PIEDAD

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

AMERICAN APPAREL USA LLC

AMERICAN APPAREL CORPORATION

AMERICAN APPAREL GROUP

AMERICAN APPAREL RETAIL INC

AMERICAN APPAREL MANUFACTURING INC

AMERICAN APPAREL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FINK KEITH A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

8/23/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY; ETC

SUMMONS

8/23/2017: SUMMONS

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFPER (CODE CIV. PROC., 1706)

8/30/2017: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFPER (CODE CIV. PROC., 1706)

Minute Order

9/13/2017: Minute Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/18/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/18/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

1/2/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTWF PIEDAD TORRES'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

12/13/2017: PLAINTWF PIEDAD TORRES'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/23/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Docketat 03:00 pm in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (against Judge Mackey, D55 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less