Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2020 at 13:36:24 (UTC).

PICADO, LILIA JEANETTE VS YANG, EUGENE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 PICADO, LILIA JEANETTE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against YANG, EUGENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HSU, WESLEY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1415

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HSU, WESLEY L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PICADO LILIA JEANETTE

Respondent

YANG EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SONG RICHARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department D, Hsu, Wesley L, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Amended ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketSupplemental (-Supporting Declration of Christine Shen in opposition to Petitioner's Request for final Restraining Order ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department D, Hsu, Wesley L, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SONG RICHARD