This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 04:31:20 (UTC).

PIA DEL PUERTO VS THOMPSON HOUSE GROUP LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/14/2017 PIA DEL PUERTO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THOMPSON HOUSE GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ERNEST HIROSHIGE, ANTHONY MOHR, SAMANTHA JESSNER and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7974

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

ANTHONY MOHR

SAMANTHA JESSNER

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DEL PUERTO PIA

Respondents and Defendants

VISUALHOUSE GROUP INC

DOES 1-50

THOMPSON HOUSE GROUP LLC

HERRICK ROBERT MICHAEL

ROBERT MICHAEL HERRICK

VISUALHOUSE USA LLC (DOE 1)

VISUALHOUSE USA LLC DOE 1

VISUALHOUSE LOS ANGELES CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BOCK & PLUMMER ATTORNEY AT LAW

BOCK MICHAEL COREY

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

ANTON N. HANDAL

HANDAL ANTON NASRI

BENDER JORDAN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) (VISUALHOUSE USA, LLC)

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) (VISUALHOUSE USA, LLC)

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF MOTION (FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION IN RE: THG)

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF MOTION (FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION IN RE: THG)

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. BOCK

2/16/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. BOCK

PLAINTIFF PIA DEL PUERTO'S NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE ANSWER OF VISUALHOUSE LOS ANGELES CORP.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITITES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. BOCK

2/16/2018: PLAINTIFF PIA DEL PUERTO'S NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE ANSWER OF VISUALHOUSE LOS ANGELES CORP.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITITES; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C. BOCK

Minute Order

2/22/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service

2/27/2018: Proof of Service

NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT - CENTRAL DISTRICT

2/27/2018: NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT - CENTRAL DISTRICT

Minute Order

3/22/2018: Minute Order

ORDER FOR REMAND

4/23/2018: ORDER FOR REMAND

Proof of Service

5/7/2018: Proof of Service

DEFENDANTS THOMPSON HOUSE GROUP, LLC AND VISUALHOUSE LOS ANGELES, CORP.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

5/7/2018: DEFENDANTS THOMPSON HOUSE GROUP, LLC AND VISUALHOUSE LOS ANGELES, CORP.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

DECLARATION OF LAUREN G. KANE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/7/2018: DECLARATION OF LAUREN G. KANE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

5/22/2018: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/29/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

5/31/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

6/11/2018: Unknown

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/24/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
255 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Pia Del Puerto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Pia Del Puerto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pia Del Puerto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1 .)VIOLATION(S) OF LABOR CODE SECTION 970 ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7974    Hearing Date: July 06, 2020    Dept: 31

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT GRANTED.

On April 14, 2017, Plaintiff Pia Del Puerto filed the instant action against Defendants Thompson House Group, LLC (“Thompson”), Visualhouse Group, Inc., Robert Michael Herrick, and Does 1 through 50. On May 2, 2017, Plaintiff filed an Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) correcting Visualhouse Group, Inc. to Visualhouse Los Angeles, Corp. (“VHLA”). On October 16, 2017, Plaintiff dismissed Defendant Robert Michael Herrick without prejudice. An Amendment to Complaint (Ficititous/Incorrect Name) was filed on November 16, 2017, naming Visualhouse USA LLC as Doe 1. Plaintiff dismissed Visualhouse USA LLC without prejudice on May 29, 2018. On August 13, 2018, Plaintiff filed the Third Amended Complaint (“TAC”). The TAC asserts causes of action for:

  1. Violation of Labor Code section 970;

  2. Unpaid Wages (Labor Code sections 200, 201, 202, 203, 204, 210, 216, 218.5, 218.6, 225.5, and 2802);

  3. Breach of Contract;

  4. Declaratory Relief; and

  5. Accounting.

On October 17, 2019, the Answers filed by Thompson and VHLA, Corp. (collectively referred to herein as “Defendants”) were ordered stricken.

Default was entered as to Defendants on February 25, 2020.

Plaintiff seeks monetary judgment against Defendants in the total amount of $143,224.71, consisting of $131,591.77 in damages, $1,284.34 in pre-judgment interest, $1,026.10 in costs, and $9,322.50 in attorney fees. Plaintiff further seeks a declaration that the paragraphs entitled “Non-Solicitation” and “Non-competition” found within Plaintiff’s Employment Agreement are entirely void and unenforceable pursuant to Business & Professions Code section 16600.

Plaintiff has submitted the requisite documentation and provided sufficient evidence to support the judgment sought. However, the Court notes that Plaintiff has failed to dismiss the remaining Doe Defendants. The Court will, on its motion, dismiss the Doe Defendants.

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s request for entry of default judgment is GRANTED as requested.  Plaintiff shall ensure that a form of judgment has previously been filed with the Court.

The parties are strongly encouraged to attend all scheduled hearings by telephone or CourtCall. All social distancing protocols will be observed at the Courthouse and in the courtrooms.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOCK MICHAEL COREY