This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2019 at 01:41:47 (UTC).

PHYLLIS ROBERSON VS COUNTRY VILLA MAR VISTA NURSING CENTER E

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 PHYLLIS ROBERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTRY VILLA MAR VISTA NURSING CENTER E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8089

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBERSON PHYLLIS

Respondents and Defendants

COUNTRY VILLA MAR VISTA NURSING CENTER

RRT ENTERPRISES LP

COUNTRY VILLA SERVICES CORP.

DOES 1-30

INTERFACE REHAB INC.

INTERFACE REHAB INC. [DOE 12]

COUNTRY VILLA SERVICES CORP. DBA COUNTRY VILLA MAR VISTA NURSING CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FOX JAMES E. ESQ.

FOX JAMES EDWARD ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

REID BRYAN ROBERT

FISCHLER MARVIN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/30/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS -

5/30/2018: SUMMONS -

DECLARATION -

8/24/2018: DECLARATION -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Request for Dismissal

11/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/7/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

10/10/2018: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/6/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/27/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/11/2019: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Phyllis Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((NOT ENTERED)); Filed by Phyllis Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Country Villa Mar Vista Nursing Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Interface Rehab, Inc. [Doe 12] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Phyllis Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Phyllis Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Phyllis Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Country Villa Mar Vista Nursing Center (Defendant); Country Villa Services Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Phyllis Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Phyllis Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Phyllis Roberson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERFACE REHAB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RPT ENTERPRISES L.P. DBA COUNTRY VILLA MAR VISTA NURSING CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where RRT ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORP. is a litigant