This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 18:17:58 (UTC).

PHILLIPS, DENISE VS RISPRESS, RUDOLPH

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 PHILLIPS, DENISE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against RISPRESS, RUDOLPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1276

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHILLIPS DENISE

Respondent

RISPRESS RUDOLPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

KOZICH S. DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

8/13/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

8/13/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

8/13/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8/13/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/13/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proof of Service

8/20/2021: Proof of Service

Response - Domestic Violence

8/31/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • Hearing09/03/2021 at 8:30 AM in As Assigned (S14,S15,S16) at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Hearing09/03/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department S16 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOZICH S. DAVID