This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 02:03:43 (UTC).

PHILLIPS, CHRISTOPHER VS PHILLIPS, SUZY

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 PHILLIPS, CHRISTOPHER filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against PHILLIPS, SUZY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHILLIPS CHRISTOPHER

Respondent

PHILLIPS SUZY

Not Classified By Court

LACEY JACKIE - District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/18/2019

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2018

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2018

DocketAbstract - of Judgment; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

DocketNotice (OF CONSOLIDATION OF CASES ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2018

DocketReply; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018

DocketProof of Service (Opposition, Memo P&A, Decl., FL150 ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018

DocketProof of Service (Opposition to petition, Memo P&A, Decl. and FL150 ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2018

DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2018

DocketOpposition (To Petition Under the Hague Covention ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2018

DocketProof of Service (PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketNotice (of Application for the Return of Minor Children ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketApplication (for Writ ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less