Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 17:24:48 (UTC).

PHILIP MARKOWITZ VS FRED BADALAMENTE

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 PHILIP MARKOWITZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FRED BADALAMENTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2176

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MARKOWITZ PHILIP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BADALAMENTE FRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

SMITH CRAIG R

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HOEFFLIN RICHARD MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/29/2021

1/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/29/2021

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/14/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

11/12/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

11/12/2020: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST JUDGE: SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

9/8/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST JUDGE: SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE) OF 09/11/2020

9/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE) OF 09/11/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)

9/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)

Proof of Service by Mail

9/17/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/24/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Philip Markowitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Fred Badalamente (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Fred Badalamente (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of 09/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (against Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason); Filed by Philip Markowitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Philip Markowitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Philip Markowitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Philip Markowitz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH CRAIG RICHARD