This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 02:35:28 (UTC).

PHILIP JUNG VS CITY OF GLENDALE ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 PHILIP JUNG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7130

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JUNG PHILIP

Respondents and Defendants

RILEY RONALD RENZONI LARZELERE

GLENDALE CITY OF

DOES 1-100

CITY OF GLENDALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

KJT LAW GROUP LLP

THOMASSIAN VACHE A.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

CITY ATTORNEY

MAURER ANN MARIE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CLERK NOTICE OF CORRECTION

8/9/2018: CLERK NOTICE OF CORRECTION

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/21/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/8/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS -

8/8/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/8/2018: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS CITY OF GLENDALE AND RONALD RILEY'S EX PARTE APPLI...)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS CITY OF GLENDALE AND RONALD RILEY'S EX PARTE APPLI...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

1/13/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE

1/13/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/18/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

8/12/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • Hearing10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City Of Glendale, (Defendant); Ronald Renzoni Larzelere Riley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Philip Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCLERK NOTICE OF CORRECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Philip Jung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMASSIAN VACHE A.