Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 18:38:08 (UTC).

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS TRIMMING LAND CO., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRIMMING LAND CO , INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0600

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MARTINEZ BASILIO

MARTINEZ ELVIRA F.

TRIMMING LAND CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOSA CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

5/6/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/10/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

12/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

1/6/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Order - ORDER ACCEPTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

12/26/2019: Order - ORDER ACCEPTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

Default Judgment

12/26/2019: Default Judgment

Trial Brief

12/26/2019: Trial Brief

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/3/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

12/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN LIEU OF PERSONAL TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Declaration - DECLARATION THAT THE COPIES OF THE EXHIBITS ARE TRUE AND CORRECT COPIES OF THE ORIGINALS

12/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION THAT THE COPIES OF THE EXHIBITS ARE TRUE AND CORRECT COPIES OF THE ORIGINALS

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/10/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/23/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/29/2019: Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding entry of default judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketOrder (Accepting Use of Copies in Lieu of Originals); Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIMMING LAND CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E