Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2021 at 01:34:00 (UTC).

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against J K RESIDENTIAL SERVICE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1718

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY

CSE SAFEGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY

LEADING INSURANCE COMPANY

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMPANY

1630 W. THIRD STREET INC.

J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICE INC.

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

JOGANI HARESH

MEHTA ANIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

DARLINGALDERTON LISA MARIE

DARLING-ALDERTON LISA

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MOORHEAD BRIDGET

DARLINGALDERTON LISA MARIE

LEE CLAYTON TAYLOR

O'CONNOR LEE

FREDERICK J ALAN

ORLOFF LANCE D

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/14/2021: Answer

Answer

11/4/2020: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/1/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

12/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Proof of Service by Mail

12/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/14/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/14/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/18/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/18/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/5/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Posting

9/16/2020: Proof of Service by Posting

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Hearing06/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Hearing06/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by Haresh Jogani (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by California Capital Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kookmin Best Insurance Co., LTD Erroneously Sued As Leading Insurance Company (Cross-Defendant); Kookmin Best Insurance Co., LTD Erroneously Sued As Leading Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mercury Casualty Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Anil Mehta (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by CSE Safeguard Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by CSE Safeguard Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CSE Safeguard Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CSE Safeguard Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by CSE Safeguard Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSE SAFEGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMAPY is a litigant

Latest cases where LEADING INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant