This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2020 at 00:39:29 (UTC).

PHD FITNESS, LLC VS NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 PHD FITNESS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8808

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHD FITNESS LLC

Defendant

NUTRADRIED CREATIONS LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DELGADO WILLIAM

GOODWIN JUSTIN TYLER

Defendant Attorney

HARSHMAN DANIEL D.

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLPS REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH

6/8/2020: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLPS REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GARY DROST IN SUPPORT OF MOTTONTO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONSANI) COMPLAINT

6/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GARY DROST IN SUPPORT OF MOTTONTO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONSANI) COMPLAINT

Notice of Settlement

8/14/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/17/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

8/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

4/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN GIBB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN GIBB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MCERLANE IN SUPPORT

3/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MCERLANE IN SUPPORT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MCERLANE IN SUPPORT

3/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MCERLANE IN SUPPORT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

3/17/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

12/16/2019: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN GIBB IN SUPPORT

12/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN GIBB IN SUPPORT

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

12/17/2019: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

11/8/2019: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/30/2019: Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons (Services of Summons and Complaint, Filed by Defendant Nutradried Creations, LLP;) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Enter Default;) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by PHD FITNESS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by PHD FITNESS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (FURTHER REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH); Filed by NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF GARY DROST IN suPPoRT OF MOTTONTO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONSANI) COMPLAINT); Filed by NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Second Amended Declaration Of John Gibb In Support Of Motion To Quash Service Of Summons And Complaint); Filed by NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketReply (DEFENDANT NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP?S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH); Filed by NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JOHN GIBB IN SUPPORT); Filed by NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by NUTRADRIED CREATIONS, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PHD FITNESS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PHD FITNESS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PHD FITNESS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PHD FITNESS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PhD Fitness LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELGADO WILLIAM ALEXANDER