This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2023 at 05:27:37 (UTC).

PFEIFER, DEBBIE LEE VS. PFEIFER, MICHAEL RICHARD

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 PFEIFER, DEBBIE LEE filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against PFEIFER, MICHAEL RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0758

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PFEIFER DEBBIE LEE

Respondent

PFEIFER MICHAEL RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SCHNEIDER JULIA DREY

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

7/9/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/9/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/9/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child

7/9/2021: Petition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child

Summons

7/9/2021: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

7/9/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service of Summons

7/28/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

8/13/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

8/13/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

11/5/2021: Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

Notice - Change of Address

12/15/2021: Notice - Change of Address

Request - Dismissal - without prejudice, as to the Petition and Entire Action (both parties signed)

4/28/2022: Request - Dismissal - without prejudice, as to the Petition and Entire Action (both parties signed)

Request - Dismissal - Request - Dismissal (Dismissals)

4/28/2022: Request - Dismissal - Request - Dismissal (Dismissals)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

8/16/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (without prejudice, as to the Petition and Entire Action (both parties signed) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (Request - Dismissal (Dismissals) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Change of Address; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice - Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPetition - Legal Separation w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less