This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2018 at 08:39:20 (UTC).

PETRONA GABRIELA OLMOS ET AL VS GRACIELA MATEOS

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 PETRONA GABRIELA OLMOS filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against GRACIELA MATEOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT L. HESS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0364

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L. HESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LAS CHAMPAS RESTAURANT

LAS CHAMPAS USA FOOD SERVICES & PRODUCTS

OLMOS PETRONA GABRIELA

Defendants and Respondents

MATEOS GRACIELA

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ANYANWU CHIMA A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/18/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/9/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

EX-PARIE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE, DECLARATION OF PETRONA GABRIELA OLMOS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ON EX-PARTE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

5/8/2017: EX-PARIE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE, DECLARATION OF PETRONA GABRIELA OLMOS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ON EX-PARTE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

5/8/2017: Unknown

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE MATTER WITH UNLAWFUL DETAINER

5/8/2017: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE MATTER WITH UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Minute Order

1/11/2018: Minute Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

12/18/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Unknown

5/8/2017: Unknown

OMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

5/5/2017: OMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

SUMMONS

5/5/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 24, Robert L. Hess, Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (OR FOR SANCTIONS) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (W/OUT PREJ. AS TO E/A ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 24, Robert L. Hess, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Order (setting osc ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less