This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 22:36:12 (UTC).

PETRA LOMELI VS ANTONIO G RAYA SR ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 PETRA LOMELI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTONIO G RAYA SR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6579

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LOMELI PETRA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

CHEUNG TUNG CHUN

DOES 1 TO 50

RAYA ANTONIO G. SR

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant

RAYA ANTONIO G. SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LALEZARY SHERVIN ESQ

PEACOR HENRY A.

WARD BRIAN J.

Defendant Attorneys

GLANTZ JASON MICHAEL

WAINFELD GABRIEL HORACE

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/21/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL & FSC

10/23/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL & FSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AN...)

10/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AN...)

Notice of Ruling

10/24/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEAN DELIS, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PETRA LOMELI TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION

12/13/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEAN DELIS, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PETRA LOMELI TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION

12/13/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION

Separate Statement

12/13/2019: Separate Statement

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GINA Y. KANDARIAN-STEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PETRA LOMELI TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION

12/31/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GINA Y. KANDARIAN-STEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PETRA LOMELI TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE PREBAY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION

1/6/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE PREBAY REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION

Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PETRA LOMELI TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATIO

1/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PETRA LOMELI TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATIO

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PETRA LOMELI TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION OFF CALENDAR

1/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF PETRA LOMELI TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION OFF CALENDAR

Separate Statement

3/26/2020: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL KAISER TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA

3/26/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL KAISER TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENA

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL/SCPMG ROI UNIT AND SO. CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP-BILLING TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA AND/OR PAY FOR A DIS

4/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL/SCPMG ROI UNIT AND SO. CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP-BILLING TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA AND/OR PAY FOR A DIS

Notice - NOTICE OF VACATED TRIAL AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

4/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF VACATED TRIAL AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TSC & TRIAL & FSC DATES VACATED

4/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TSC & TRIAL & FSC DATES VACATED

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Hearing08/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial & Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial & Related D...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial & Related Dates); Filed by Petra Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date); Filed by Petra Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Antonio G. Sr Raya (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Antonio G. Sr Raya (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Petra Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petra Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Petra Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Petra Lomeli (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE 2. GENERAL NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6579    Hearing Date: September 18, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

PETRA LOMELI

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ANTONIO G. RAYA, SR., et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

) ) ) )

****6579

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS’ COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA AND/OR PAY FOR A DISCOVERY REFEREE TO ASSIST IN THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

September 18, 2020

On December 12, 2017, plaintiff Petra Lomeli filed this action against defendants Antonio G. Raya, Sr. and Tung Chun Cheung arising from a November 9, 2016 three-car motor vehicle collision.  On February 13, 2020, Defendant issued subpoenas to nonparty Kaiser Foundation Hospital/SCPMG ROI Unit and So. California Permanente Medical Group-Billing (“Kaiser”) requesting medical and billing records of Plaintiff over the last 10 years with a production date of March 9, 2020.  The medical and billing records were limited to those relating to specific body parts and symptoms (i.e., head, skull, brain, cervical spine, headaches, thoracic spine, lumbosacral spine, neck, lower back, upper back, left shoulder, right shoulder, numbness and tingling, pins and needles sensation, left leg, and right leg).

A party seeking discovery from a person who is not a party to the action may obtain discovery by oral deposition, written deposition, or deposition subpoena for production of business records.  (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2020.010.)  A deponent who disobeys a deposition subpoena may be punished for contempt without the necessity of a prior order of the court directing compliance by the witness.  (Code Civ. Proc., ; 2020.240.)

Kaiser stated it was unable to comply with this subpoena because its records system is not set up to sort records by body parts, medical conditions, or symptomsKaiser offered to provide records by date range, department types, or provider names or suggested appointing a discovery referee.  Plaintiff has not objected to the subpoena or the Motion. 

Defendant moves to compel Kaiser’s compliance with the subpoena.  

In opposition, Kaiser states that it is willing to comply with the subpoena as long as the subpoenas are not limited by body parts.  This issue is moot as Defendant is already amenable to removing that part of the subpoena.  It also appears in Defendant’s reply that Defendant is open to the idea of having the records sorted by date range and Kaiser is able to do so.  

Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendant’s Motion in part and orders Kaiser to produce Plaintiff’s medical records from November 9, 2006 to the present As to the appropriate method for distribution of these records, the Court finds that the records should be disbursed to counsel for both parties.  Counsel, as officers of the court, can then be trusted to meet and confer regarding which documents should be destroyed as irrelevant.  

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

18th day of September 2020

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD BRIAN J. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEACOR HENRY ANDREWS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LALEZARY SHERVIN ESQ.