This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:07:28 (UTC).

PETERSON, SAMUEL L VS MOUROUX, LAURA

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 PETERSON, SAMUEL L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOUROUX, LAURA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8455

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PETERSON SAMUEL L

Respondent

MOUROUX LAURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COHAN SABRINA S

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/26/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

7/26/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

7/23/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/23/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

7/23/2021: Summons

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

12/8/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Respondent's Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

12/30/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Respondent's Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Petitioner's Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

12/30/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Petitioner's Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

12/30/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Request - Enter Default FL165

6/2/2022: Request - Enter Default FL165

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected - Petitioner's name does not match

5/31/2022: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected - Petitioner's name does not match

Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170

5/31/2022: Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170

 

Docket Entries

06/02/2022

DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022

DocketDeclaration - Default FL170 (Declaration - Default FL170 ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022

DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Rejected - Petitioner's name does not match ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Petitioner's Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Respondent's Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021

DocketNotice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketNotice - Case Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2021

DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2021

DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2021

DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less