This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 06:13:36 (UTC).

PETERSON, GERALD B. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 PETERSON, GERALD B - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KLEIN, CLIFFORD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3368

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAPP JULIE ANN

Claimant

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

Decedent

PETERSON GERALD B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEYER-MORRIS DEBORAH ANN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

4/18/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

4/18/2017: PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

4/18/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

4/18/2017: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

4/27/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Supplement - Supplemental Petition For Probate Of Will and For Letters Testamentary

5/18/2017: Supplement - Supplemental Petition For Probate Of Will and For Letters Testamentary

Proof of Publication

5/18/2017: Proof of Publication

Will - Admitted

5/22/2017: Will - Admitted

Minute Order

5/22/2017: Minute Order

Order - Probate

6/19/2017: Order - Probate

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Amended

7/6/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Amended

Letters (Initial) - Executor with full authority

7/6/2017: Letters (Initial) - Executor with full authority

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

11/1/2017: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application

11/1/2017: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

11/3/2017: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Letters - Amended - Executor with Full Authority

11/3/2017: Letters - Amended - Executor with Full Authority

Order - Ex Parte Order

11/3/2017: Order - Ex Parte Order

Order - Ex Parte Order

11/3/2017: Order - Ex Parte Order

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Receipt (Receipt ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Declaration (Of Julie Ann Lapp ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Petition Granted (First and Final Account approved on 03//20/19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Will (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Supplement (Supplemental Petition For Probate Of Will and For Letters Testamentary ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Petition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYER-MORRIS DEBORAH