This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 09:12:01 (UTC).

PETERSON, DARLENE JOAN - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 PETERSON, DARLENE JOAN - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8998

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Conservator and Petitioner

NELSON SALLY

Interested Parties

KAY CINDY

KERESEY TERI

PETERSON SHERI

Not Classified By Court

PETERSON DARLENE JOAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

IMEL LAWRENCE JENNINGS

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COLE JONATHAN M. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing - 11/18/22

9/13/2022: Notice - Hearing - 11/18/22

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

9/9/2022: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook

Citation - Issued

9/9/2022: Citation - Issued

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

9/9/2022: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

9/9/2022: Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

9/19/2022: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Order - Appointing Counsel

9/19/2022: Order - Appointing Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 10:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (11/18/22 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCitation (Issued ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE JONATHAN M. ESQ