Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 11:38:50 (UTC).

PETER YEUNG VS PANDA AMERICA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 PETER YEUNG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PANDA AMERICA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0695

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

YEUNG PETER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PANDA AMERICA INC.

QUAN KITTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

VARTIAN ARMEN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KING DAVID

HSU ROGER C.

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PANDA AMERICA CORPORATION ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PANDA AMERICA, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/5/2021: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT PANDA AMERICA CORPORATION ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PANDA AMERICA, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

5/12/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS

4/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer - CROSS-DEFENDANT PETER YEUNG'S ANSWER TO PANDA AMERICA, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/18/2020: Answer - CROSS-DEFENDANT PETER YEUNG'S ANSWER TO PANDA AMERICA, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

11/19/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

11/19/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/19/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

11/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/5/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • Hearing08/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kitty Quan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant Panda America Corporation Erroneously sued as Panda America, Inc. to First Amended Complaint); Filed by Panda America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To File First Amended Complaint with Exhibits); Filed by Peter Yeung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Peter Yeung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCross-Defendant Peter Yeung's Answer to Panda America, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint; Filed by Peter Yeung (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address); Filed by Peter Yeung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Panda America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kitty Quan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Peter Yeung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Peter Yeung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Yeung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peter Yeung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Yeung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PANDA AMERICA INC. is a litigant