This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 01:19:54 (UTC).

PETER POCHNA VS SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 PETER POCHNA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0080

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POCHNA PETER

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant

SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BECKER BRIAN L.

SLOAN-TRIBE WYATT E

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

5/8/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

4/30/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

4/19/2019: Notice

Petition

4/22/2019: Petition

Motion for Attorney Fees

4/23/2019: Motion for Attorney Fees

Minute Order

4/17/2019: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/17/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order

4/17/2019: Order

Notice of Ruling

4/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Demurrer

4/11/2019: Demurrer

Notice of Ruling

4/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

4/5/2019: Unknown

Request for Judicial Notice

4/8/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order

4/10/2019: Minute Order

Reply

4/10/2019: Reply

Objection

4/10/2019: Objection

Motion for Summary Adjudication

4/2/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Peter Pochna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (That Plaintiff's Petition For Declaratory Judgment Supersede Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint); Filed by Sentinel Peak Resources California, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Filed by Sentinel Peak Resources California, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketPetition (for Declaratory Judgment); Filed by Peter Pochna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNotice ( OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT THE DEPARTMENT OF CONSERVATION, DIVISION OF OIL, GAS, AND GEOTHERMAL RESOURCES); Filed by California Department of Conservation, Division of Oil, Gas, and Geothermal Resources (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jerry J Vathielil Re inablility to comply with meet and confer requirement as to demurrer and automatic extension to respond pursuant to ccp Section 430.41 (a)(2)); Filed by Sentinel Peak Resources California, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Peter Pochna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Peter Pochna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Pochna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Pochna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Peter Pochna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER, BRIAN L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WYATT E. SLOAN-TRIBE