This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 01:45:29 (UTC).

PETER MICAHEL BOESEN JR ET AL VS CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSUR

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 PETER MICAHEL BOESEN JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6631

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BOESEN PETER MICHAEL JR. CO-TRUSTEE OF

BOESEN STACY CO-TRUSTEE OF THE BOESEN

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

DOES 1-10

Cross Defendants

KELLY ROBERT

C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM INC

KELLY TRACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEAR EDWARD O. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SHAVER KORFE & CASTRONOVO LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

6/18/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Minute Order

6/27/2018: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/19/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/19/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINANT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

7/19/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINANT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/20/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

7/27/2018: C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/22/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT

9/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/24/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

9/25/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

12/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/23/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

SUMMONS

5/17/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1)BREACH OF CONTRACT 2)TORTIOUS BREACH OF CONTRACT

5/17/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1)BREACH OF CONTRACT 2)TORTIOUS BREACH OF CONTRACT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (With prejudice, Cross-complaint filed by California Automobile Insurance Co. filed 7/19/18 As to Cross-defendants, Robert Kelly and Tracy Kelly, Only); Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by ROBERT KELLY (Cross-Defendant); TRACY KELLY (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • CROSS-COMPLAINANT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Boesen, Peter Michael JR. co-trustee of (Plaintiff); Boesen, Stacy co-trustee of the Boesen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1)BREACH OF CONTRACT 2)TORTIOUS BREACH OF CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Boesen, Peter Michael JR. co-trustee of (Plaintiff); Boesen, Stacy co-trustee of the Boesen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Boesen, Peter Michael JR. co-trustee of (Plaintiff); Boesen, Stacy co-trustee of the Boesen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & C PARTNERS DESIGN/BUILD FIRM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEAR EDWARD O. ESQ.