This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2020 at 03:41:31 (UTC).

PETER KLEIDMAN VS RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, LP

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 PETER KLEIDMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1711

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLEIDMAN PETER

Defendant

RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LP

 

Court Documents

Request for Judicial Notice

12/3/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion re: - MOTION RE: AN INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, LP

12/3/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: AN INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, LP

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/27/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • Hearing04/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion - Other for Interlocutory Judgment in Favor of RFF Family Partnership, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Hearing04/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketMotion re: (an Interlocutory Judgment in Favor of RFF Family Partnership, LP); Filed by Peter Kleidman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Peter Kleidman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Kleidman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peter Kleidman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Kleidman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19SMCV01711    Hearing Date: October 01, 2020    Dept: O

Case Name: Kleidman v. RFF Family Partnership, LP, et al.

Case No.: 19SMCV01711

Complaint Filed: 9-27-19

Hearing Date: 10-1-20

Discovery C/O: None

Calendar No.: 5

Discover Motion C/O: None

POS: OK

Trial Date: None

SUBJECT:    MOTION FOR ENTRY OF INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY:  Plaintiff Peter Kleidman, in pro per

RESP. PARTY: None as of 9-30-20

TENTATIVE RULING

Plaintiff Kleidman’s Motion for Entry of Interlocutory Judgment is DENIED.  The motion seeks entry of an interlocutory judgment in favor Defendant RFF Family Partnership, LP. However, Kleidman failed to serve the motion on Defendant RFF Family Partnership, LP. 

Kleidman also fails to establish entitlement to an interlocutory judgment based on CCP §597 and CCP §430.10(c).  CCP §430.10(c) allows a defendant to demur to a complaint on grounds that there is another action pending between the same parties on the same cause of action.  CCP §597 allows the court to enter an interlocutory judgment in the defendant’s favor where the defendant’s demurrer based on CCP §430.10(c) is sustained, such that “no trial of other issues shall be had until the final determination of that other action…” 

Kleidman is not the defendant in this action, nor is he a defendant in SC121303, the action he claims justifies entry of an interlocutory judgment under CCP §597.  Defendant RFF has not demurred to the complaint in this action based on CCP §430.10(c).  The motion is denied. 

page-break-before:always">

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RFF FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LP is a litigant