This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 17:13:00 (UTC).

PETER JONES, ET AL. VS FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 PETER JONES filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0966

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES CHARLOTTE FRIEZE

JONES PETER

Defendant

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUMBINER JOEL PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees

6/23/2022: Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peter Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Jones (Plaintiff); Charlotte Frieze Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees; Filed by Peter Jones (Plaintiff); Charlotte Frieze Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Jones (Plaintiff); Charlotte Frieze Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Jones (Plaintiff); Charlotte Frieze Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUMBINER, JOEL P.