This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 02:12:28 (UTC).

PETER HAY VS DIETER MAY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 PETER HAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIETER MAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5968

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAY PETER

Defendants

MAY DIETER

MAY KARIN

MAY HERMANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EASTON W. DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

MUENCH RICHARD A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/14/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

2/26/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

2/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

4/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/15/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/15/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/15/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

7/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Peter Hay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hermann May (Defendant); Karin May (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Hermann May (Defendant); Karin May (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hermann May (Defendant); Karin May (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Peter Hay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Peter Hay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Peter Hay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Hay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peter Hay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Hay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTON W. DOUGLAS