This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2023 at 19:07:17 (UTC).

PETER HAVILAND, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 PETER HAVILAND, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1106

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAVILAND PETER

WHEATON RENA

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX DAVE

Defendant Attorneys

HUESTON JOHN

HUESTON ESQ JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: VON OEYEN HOUSEHOLD; ORDER TO SHOW CAUS...)

5/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: VON OEYEN HOUSEHOLD; ORDER TO SHOW CAUS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

1/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

1/6/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

12/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/22/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Von Oeyen Household; Order to Show Caus...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Trailed was rescheduled to 05/01/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/26/2023 03:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why the St...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Peter Haviland (Plaintiff); Rena Wheaton (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Peter Haviland (Plaintiff); Rena Wheaton (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Peter Haviland (Plaintiff); Rena Wheaton (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less