This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 00:38:28 (UTC).

PETER GEORGES VS SJWS ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2018 PETER GEORGES filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against SJWS ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8948

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGES PETER

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

IMANI RECORDS LLC

SHARIF SEAN

CODRINGTON YOLANDA

SJWS ENTERPRISES INC.

HALLEY MANNY

SHARIF SAM

SHARIF SAMEER ALI

HALLEY IMANI

HOUSE OF MACAO

SHARIF SAMEER ALI AKA SHAMSUDDIN ALI SHERIF AKA SHASU A. SHARIF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN JAY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for

8/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

8/7/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/9/2019: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Memorandum

2/4/2019: Memorandum

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/4/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/4/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/4/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/14/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/31/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order

1/2/2019: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/3/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/3/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 08/07/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by PETER GEORGES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PETER GEORGES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by PETER GEORGES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PETER GEORGES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC128948    Hearing Date: July 28, 2020    Dept: P

 

Tentative Ruling

Peter Georges v. SJWS Enterprises, Inc., Case No. SC128948

Hearing Date July 27, 2020

Request for Entry of Default Judgment

The court has reviewed the default judgment packet and identified the following issues:

- The stock purchase agreement and shareholders agreement which form the basis of the action list plaintiff, SJWS enterprises, Sean Sharif, and Sam Sharif as parties. See Exhibit 1 pg. 1, Exhibit 2 pg. 1. Defendants Imani Halley, Yolanda Codrington, and Imani Records, LLC are not parties and plaintiff does not adequately explain the basis of their liability.

- Plaintiff’s declaration does not clearly set forth the basis for the claimed damages.

- Plaintiff’s request for $7,486.62 in attorney’s fees exceeds the amount allowed under local rule 3.214.

Default is therefore DENIED. Plaintiff will file a new declaration/judgment packet addressing the above issues.

DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC, PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO AVOID IN-PERSON APPEARANCES AND TO APPEAR BY COURT CALL WHENEVER POSSIBLE.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SJWS ENTERPRISES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN JAY