This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 01:30:11 (UTC).

PETER FAI TANGWA VS LINDA KAY ENDICOTT WILSON

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 PETER FAI TANGWA filed an Other lawsuit against LINDA KAY ENDICOTT WILSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4651

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TANGWA PETER FAI

Respondent

LINDA KAY ENDICOTT WILSON AS TRUSTEE OF THE EDITH L. STEVENS TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MAY WILLIAM DEREK

Respondent Attorney

KRASNEY ROBERT ALAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

2/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/21/2020

2/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/21/2020

Case Management Statement

2/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

1/17/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Answer

1/24/2020: Answer

Notice of Related Case

12/23/2019: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/19/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/31/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/25/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/25/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 1:12 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Peter Fai Tangwa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:34 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Linda Kay Endicott Wilson, as trustee of the Edith L. Stevens Trust (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketOpposition (to Notice of Related Cases); Filed by Linda Kay Endicott Wilson, as trustee of the Edith L. Stevens Trust (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Peter Fai Tangwa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Peter Fai Tangwa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peter Fai Tangwa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Fai Tangwa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Fai Tangwa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Fai Tangwa (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******4651 Hearing Date: December 20, 2021 Dept: 19

After consideration of the briefing filed and oral argument at the hearing, Defendant Linda Kay Endicott (as Trustee of the Estate of Edith L. Stevens Trust)’s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED. Leave to amend is DENIED. A full written ruling will be filed. Counsel for Defendant to file a proposed judgment of dismissal and to give notice.

'


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRASNEY ROBERT ALAN