This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2020 at 00:18:15 (UTC).

PETER EDWARDS VS HAR-BRO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 PETER EDWARDS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAR-BRO, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0621

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARDS PETER

Defendants

HAR-BRO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY

BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS LLC

HAR-BRO LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALKANA EUGENE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

11/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/12/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Peter Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Peter Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Peter Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Peter Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Peter Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peter Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAR-BRO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant