Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 22:00:25 (UTC).

PETER CHEN VS BARRY SHAW & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 PETER CHEN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BARRY SHAW ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD ROSENBERG, MARC D. GROSS and MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9562

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GERALD ROSENBERG

MARC D. GROSS

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHEN PETER

CHEN JENNY

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

BARRY SHAW & ASSOCIATES INC.

SHAW BARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EARLE JAMES C.

DIAZ RENEE SHARON

EARLE JAMES CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

LANAK & HANNA P.C.

STEINER LEONARD

STEINER LEONARD SAMUEL

KIM AMBER NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summary of the Case

6/14/2021: Summary of the Case

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/29/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION TO STRIKE BARRY SHAW ASSOC...)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION TO STRIKE BARRY SHAW ASSOC...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKING THE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO AP...)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STRIKING THE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO AP...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

4/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/29/2020: Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

10/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/7/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES C. EARLE IN OPPOSITION TO LEONARD STEINERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR BARRY SHAW A

6/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES C. EARLE IN OPPOSITION TO LEONARD STEINERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR BARRY SHAW A

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/11/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

2/10/2020: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RENEE S. DIAZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

5/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RENEE S. DIAZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

5/3/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: First Amended Complaint

8/6/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: First Amended Complaint

Request for Judicial Notice

8/17/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Separate Statement of Und. Facts

8/17/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Separate Statement of Und. Facts

Declaration - Of James C. Earle

8/17/2018: Declaration - Of James C. Earle

142 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • Hearing08/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Renee S. Diaz); Filed by Jenny Chen (Plaintiff); Peter Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Jenny Chen (Plaintiff); Peter Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments (Court Judgment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by Jenny Chen (Plaintiff); Peter Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jenny Chen (Plaintiff); Peter Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Peter Chen); Filed by Jenny Chen (Plaintiff); Peter Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Peter Chen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by BARRY SHAW & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Defendant); BARRY SHAW (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketOther - (Civil Deposit); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by PETER CHEN (Plaintiff); JENNY CHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by PETER CHEN (Plaintiff); JENNY CHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by BARRY SHAW & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Defendant); BARRY SHAW (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to Diff. Department) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by PETER CHEN (Plaintiff); JENNY CHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PETER CHEN (Plaintiff); JENNY CHEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EARLE, JAMES C