This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2020 at 17:05:10 (UTC).

PETER BOESEN, ET AL. VS NEIL ERICKSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 PETER BOESEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEIL ERICKSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6843

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOESEN PETER

BOESEN STACY

THE BOESEN LIVING TRUST

Defendants

LEAR EDWARD

OCAMPO MARISOL

LAPPEN TIMOTHY

CENTURY LAW GROUP LLP

ADJEI AFUA

JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP

ERICKSON NEIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELIG STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

SEDOR DAN P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/25/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

10/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Related Case

9/30/2020: Notice of Related Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Peter Boesen (Plaintiff); Stacy Boesen (Plaintiff); The Boesen Living Trust Dated June 18, 2003 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Boesen (Plaintiff); Stacy Boesen (Plaintiff); The Boesen Living Trust Dated June 18, 2003 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peter Boesen (Plaintiff); Stacy Boesen (Plaintiff); The Boesen Living Trust Dated June 18, 2003 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Boesen (Plaintiff); Stacy Boesen (Plaintiff); The Boesen Living Trust Dated June 18, 2003 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BOESEN LIVING TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where JEFFER MANGELS BUTLER & MITCHELL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZELIG STEVEN