This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 11:51:09 (UTC).

PETER BERROCAL VS LE PEGASUS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 PETER BERROCAL filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LE PEGASUS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WENDY CHANG, MICHAEL C. KELLEY and MARCELO D'ASERO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0433

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WENDY CHANG

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

MARCELO D'ASERO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERROCAL PETER

Defendants

LE PEGASUS LLC

SJO INVESTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPERO SARAH

Defendant Attorney

ENOCHS JON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS AS TO THE NAMED DEFENDANT SJO ...)

4/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS AS TO THE NAMED DEFENDANT SJO ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS AS TO THE NAMED DEFENDANT SJO ...) OF 04/25/2022

4/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS AS TO THE NAMED DEFENDANT SJO ...) OF 04/25/2022

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Judgment

12/28/2021: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/28/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISM...)

12/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISM...)

Notice of Ruling

1/5/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

1/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARON FLECK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES OF $26,625.00 AND COSTS OF $1,767.03

1/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARON FLECK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES OF $26,625.00 AND COSTS OF $1,767.03

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D. POINDEXTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES OF $26,625.00 AND COSTS OF $1,767.03

1/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D. POINDEXTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES OF $26,625.00 AND COSTS OF $1,767.03

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES

1/11/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/11/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion for Attorney Fees

1/11/2022: Motion for Attorney Fees

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

1/11/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES OF $26,625.00 AND COSTS OF $1,767.03

2/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES OF $26,625.00 AND COSTS OF $1,767.03

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status as to the named defendant SJO Investments, APO (named on First Amended Complaint)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status as to the named defendant SJO ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Status as to the named defendant SJO ...) of 04/25/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketOrder (on Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees of $26,625.00 and Costs of $1,767.03); Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketJudgment (- Amended); Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining O...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Sarah Shapero); Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Peter Berrocal); Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for a Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain the Recording of a Trustee?s Deed Upon Sale); Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order to Restrain the Recording of a Trustee's Deed Upon Sale); Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order to Restraint Recording of Trustee's Deed Upon Sale); Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LE PEGASUS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SJO INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENOCHS JON