Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 15:00:36 (UTC).

PERSOLVE LEGAL GROUP, LLP VS EDDY JANG

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 PERSOLVE LEGAL GROUP, LLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDDY JANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0472

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSOLVE LEGAL GROUP LLP

Defendant

JANG EDDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS SARAH JANE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

11/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/2/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution

12/2/2020: Writ of Execution

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

10/6/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Request for Dismissal

10/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION INTEREST

10/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION INTEREST

Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST EDDY JANG

10/9/2020: Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST EDDY JANG

Case Management Statement

9/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service - No Service

9/2/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/6/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration - DECLARATION RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

7/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/3/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default and Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment (against Eddy Jang); Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Interest); Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE); Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Persolve Legal Group, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS SARAH JANE