This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2021 at 16:39:46 (UTC).

PERRY, KISHAYA VS PERRY, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 PERRY, KISHAYA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PERRY, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1461

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PERRY KISHAYA

Respondent

PERRY CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MILES JOY WREN

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

8/30/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

8/30/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8/27/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

8/27/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

8/27/2021: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

8/27/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

10/21/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

10/20/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Proof of Service of Summons - FL-100, FL-110, Blank FL-120, Amended FL-100, FL-141, FAM-111, FAM-094, etc

10/25/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - FL-100, FL-110, Blank FL-120, Amended FL-100, FL-141, FAM-111, FAM-094, etc

Declaration - Keech DEC of attorney Joy Kraft Miles, in support of attorney fee request of Petitioner

10/20/2021: Declaration - Keech DEC of attorney Joy Kraft Miles, in support of attorney fee request of Petitioner

Declaration - Separate Property

10/20/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - in support in Petitioner's request for order for child custody and visitation, child support, attorney's fees and costs, and bifurcation of the issue of validity

10/20/2021: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - in support in Petitioner's request for order for child custody and visitation, child support, attorney's fees and costs, and bifurcation of the issue of validity

Petition - Amended (1st)

10/20/2021: Petition - Amended (1st)

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Attorney's Fees and Costs, Other, see Paragraph 8

10/20/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support - Attorney's Fees and Costs, Other, see Paragraph 8

Declaration - Income and Expense

10/20/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • Hearing02/03/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department F48 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (FL-100, FL-110, Blank FL-120, Amended FL-100, FL-141, FAM-111, FAM-094, etc ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Keech DEC of attorney Joy Kraft Miles, in support of attorney fee request of Petitioner ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (in support in Petitioner's request for order for child custody and visitation, child support, attorney's fees and costs, and bifurcation of the issue of validity of the premarital agreement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPetition - Amended (1st); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child and Spousal Support (Attorney's Fees and Costs, Other, see Paragraph 8 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (fax filing )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILES JOY WREN