This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 11:08:30 (UTC).

PERLA MAGENO VS UNICE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 PERLA MAGENO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against UNICE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are COLIN P. LEIS and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0408

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

COLIN P. LEIS

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGENO PERLA

Defendant

UNICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JR. JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

GROSS KENNETH I.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

3/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/23/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service by Mail

1/10/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/6/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/8/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/26/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

9/9/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/24/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/27/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • Hearing07/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Mediation and Discovery scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Mediation and Discovery)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Mediation and Discovery scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/04/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Joseph Manning Jr. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAddress for Joseph Manning Jr. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Alhambra Courthouse in Department 3 - Hon. William A. Crowfooteffective 01/17/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: UNICE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: UNICE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/18/2022; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: UNICE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: UNICE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: UNICE, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less